+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 761
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 597
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 615
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 560
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 564
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 542
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 375
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 341
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 300
- Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1158ta
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 154
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 35
February 22, 2013: Local Government Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
February 7, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 70
February 5, 2013: Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor