+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 651
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 559
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 570
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 509
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 535
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 514
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 477
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 424
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 342
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 312
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 266
- Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1153ob
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 153
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 21, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
February 15, 2013: Taxation Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
February 5, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2013: Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor