+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 676
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 659
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 540
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 621
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 0. S.J. 500
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 476
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 241
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 296
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 261
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 151
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2014: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
February 26, 2014: Local Government Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 70