+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 716
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 600
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 574
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 558
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 533
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 503
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 318
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 306
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 256
- Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1151ya
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 202
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2015: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2015: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 3
February 3, 2015: Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3