+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Tabled, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 575
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 555
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 531
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 514
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 496
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. S.J. 467
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 453
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 53, NAYS 14. H.J. 684
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 650
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 475
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 212
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2016: Senate Tabled, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
February 29, 2016: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor