+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 686
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 46, NAYS 19. H.J. 650
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 7. S.J. 607
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 607 Amendment 1141fb
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1141ja
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 523
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 39, NAYS 29. H.J. 474
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 438
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 399
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1141wa
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 246
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2017: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 5
March 1, 2017: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 7
February 27, 2017: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
February 22, 2017: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor