+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 491
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 2. H.J. 545
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 455
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1140B
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 355
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 386
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1140A
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 105
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2020: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
March 9, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 5, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 25, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor