+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 305
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 41, NAYS 25. H.J. 339
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 339 Amendment 1133E
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 6.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 117
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 98
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2020: Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
February 20, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 18, 2020: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed
February 13, 2020: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Failed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor