+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Tabled, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 624
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 520
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 43, NAYS 24. H.J. 535
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 488
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1132wb
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Judiciary Title amended, Passed Amendment 1132kta
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1132wa
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 198
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2019: Judiciary Tabled, Passed
February 25, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 22, 2019: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor