+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 526
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 356
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 40, NAYS 27. H.J. 346
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 333
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 281
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1129rb
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1129ra
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 198
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House H.J. 182
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2015: Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 9, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 3
February 4, 2015: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor