+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 518
- Education Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 4.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 435
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 37, NAYS 32. H.J. 404
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 404 Amendment 1128cc
- House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 38, NAYS 31. H.J. 403
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Intent to reconsider H.J. 372
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 35. H.J. 371
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested, Passed H.J. 286
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 286 Amendment 1128cb
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 3. H.J. 247
- Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1128jb
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 131
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 21, 2013: Education Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2013: Education Do Pass, Failed
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2013: House of Representatives Reconsidered, Passed
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 1
February 13, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 35
January 30, 2013: Education Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1