+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 880
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 845
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 577
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 807
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 529
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 500
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 428
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 3. H.J. 636
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 417
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 386
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 198
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 2, 2016: Local Government Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 23, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor