+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2019 H.J. 562
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 527
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 443
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 0. S.J. 389
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 363
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 280
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 298
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1. H.J. 276
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 197
+ − Votes (3)
February 14, 2019: Senate Do Pass, Passed
February 13, 2019: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed
February 5, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor