+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 552
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 437
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 293
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 318 Amendment 1123E
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 318
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 318 Amendment 1123B
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 304
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1123A
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 107
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 83
+ − Votes (4)
March 5, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 4, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 19, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 12, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor