+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on February 19, 2019 H.J. 426
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 14, 2019 H.J. 403
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 373
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 382
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 332
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 310
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 264
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 283
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 246
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 196
+ − Votes (4)
February 11, 2019: Senate Do Pass, Passed
February 8, 2019: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed
January 31, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
January 30, 2019: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor