+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 881
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 860
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 591
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 845
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 549
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 521
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 322
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 399
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 355
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 196
+ − Votes (3)
March 7, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2016: Education Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor