+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 552
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 8. S.J. 440
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 256
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 45, NAYS 25. H.J. 302
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 107
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 83