+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 487
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 369
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 44, NAYS 23. H.J. 368
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 338
- Deferred by Chair, Passed
- State Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 5.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House State Affairs, Passed H.J. 226
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 179
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2015: Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 10, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
February 9, 2015: State Affairs Do Pass, Failed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 9, 2015: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor