+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 37. H.J. 415
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Intent to reconsider H.J. 398
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 34. H.J. 398
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. H.J. 351
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Education Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 7, NAYS 7.
- Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1116ca
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 195
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2019: House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed
February 13, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed
February 11, 2019: Education Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 8, 2019: Education Do Pass Amended, Failed
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor