+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor H.J. 530
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 455
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 369
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 431
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 344
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 236
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 255
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent,
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 153
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 29, NAYS 6. S.J. 344
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 6
February 23, 2021: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 9, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 255
- Yeas: 70
February 8, 2021: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2