+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 790
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 787
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 684
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 781
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 766
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 761 Amendment Cc1111
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 665
- Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 660 Amendment Cc1111
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed H.J. 745
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 646
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 628 Amendment 1111mta
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 627
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 627 Amendment 1111ma
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 602
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 575
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 562
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 540
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 507
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 452
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 509
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 493
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 476
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 455
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 441
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 416
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 407
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 382
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 365
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 341
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 325
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 301
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 285
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 243
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 117
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
March 13, 2014: House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
- Yeas: 70
March 13, 2014: Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
- Yeas: 35
March 11, 2014: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2014: Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 70
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor