+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 740
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 699
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 738
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 727
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 1. H.J. 702
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 658
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 658 Amendment 1110aa
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1110me
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0. S.J. 621
- State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 1110mtd
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 500
On February 22, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 7. H.J. 471
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 433
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 403
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 367
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 145
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 2011: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 1
March 8, 2011: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2011: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2011: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2011: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 13