+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2. S.J. 582
- Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 2, NAYS 4.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 402
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 6. H.J. 393
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 378
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 320
- Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1109fb
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 212
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2017: Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2017: Judiciary Do Pass, Failed
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2017: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
February 7, 2017: Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor