+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 710
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 706
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 441
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 651
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 400
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 354
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 292
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 362
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 340
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 182
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2016: Local Government Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 10, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1