+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 552
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 437
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 338
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 358
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 75
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2020: Senate Do Pass, Passed
March 4, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 24, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor