+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 784
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 767
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 496
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 724
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 458
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 425
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 219
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 267
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 228
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 181
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2016: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
February 24, 2016: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
February 3, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor