+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 9, NAYS 25. S.J. 606
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 558
- Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. Amendment 1103rc
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 355
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 54, NAYS 13. H.J. 353
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 323
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 159
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2015: Senate Do Pass Amended, Failed
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2015: Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
March 3, 2015: Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 9, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
February 6, 2015: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor