+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Tabled, Passed, YEAS 62, NAYS 0. H.J. 214
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 188
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 161
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 124
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 91
+ − Votes (2)
January 25, 2018: House of Representatives Tabled, Passed
January 22, 2018: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (99)
Type:
Primary Sponsor