+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 12, 2020 H.J. 602
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 552
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 437
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 256
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 303
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 283
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 75
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2020: Senate Do Pass, Passed
March 4, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 18, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor