+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2018 H.J. 696
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 27, 2018 H.J. 615
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 605
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 592
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 557
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 521
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 271
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 210
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 165
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 91
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2018: Senate Do Pass, Passed
February 20, 2018: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed
January 25, 2018: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor