+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 H.J. 758
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2017 H.J. 738
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 686
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 701
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 11. S.J. 647
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 615
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 402
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 8. H.J. 390
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 378
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 363
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 352
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 337
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 304
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 211
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2017: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2017: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 14, 2017: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor