+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 552
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 503
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 480
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 459
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 0. S.J. 435
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 404
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 282
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 269
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 242
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 158
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 2015: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 4
February 17, 2015: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor