+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 582
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1096bc
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1096bb
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 356
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 11. H.J. 348
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 337
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 2. H.J. 290
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1096ba
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 193
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2017: Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 8, 2017: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 4
February 3, 2017: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor