+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 09, 2020 H.J. 537
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 05, 2020 H.J. 480
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 421
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 458
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 386
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 293
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 320
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1095A
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 63
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 27, 2020: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed
February 19, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 13, 2020: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor