+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 25, 2020
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 10, 2020 H.J. 538
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 470
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 498
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 419
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 189
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 4. H.J. 247
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 232
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 76
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 62
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2020: Senate Do Pass, Passed
March 3, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 10, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
February 6, 2020: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor