+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 26, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 491
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 4. H.J. 544
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 457
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1092B
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2.
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 189
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 11. H.J. 247
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 232
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. Amendment 1092A
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 63
+ − Votes (5)
March 10, 2020: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
March 9, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 5, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 10, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 5, 2020: Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor