+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 H.J. 626
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 552
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 535
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 437
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 205
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 260
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Remove from Consent Calendar H.J. 243
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 63