+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 583
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 258
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 323 Amendment 1089xta
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 323
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 288
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair, Passed
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 81
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 10, 2014: Appropriations Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 6, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 5, 2014: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor