+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 620
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 H.J. 618
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 541
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 582
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 455
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1088E
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 385
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 0. H.J. 429
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1088C
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 63