+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 H.J. 650
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 618
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 622
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 551
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 536
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 350
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 359
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 346
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. H.J. 320
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 172
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2019: Senate Do Pass, Passed
February 27, 2019: Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass, Passed
February 11, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor