+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 H.J. 712
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 H.J. 650
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 618
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 622
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 551
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 532
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 475
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 466
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 405
- Military and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1080ca
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 171
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2019: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 27, 2019: Taxation Do Pass, Passed
February 21, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 13, 2019: Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (48)
Type:
Primary Sponsor