+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on February 27, 2020 H.J. 435
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 21, 2020 H.J. 347
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 297
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 323
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 239
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 109
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 77
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 44
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 2020: Senate Do Pass, Passed
February 13, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
January 28, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor