+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 598
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 545
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 441
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 494
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 384
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 358
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 224
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 3. H.J. 283
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 1. H.J. 173
- Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1074ja
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair, Passed
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 60
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2014: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2014: Local Government Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
February 4, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2014: Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
January 28, 2014: Deferred by Chair, Passed
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor