+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 676
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 637
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 524
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 594
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 482
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 444
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 187
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 179
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 140
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 59
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2014: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
February 25, 2014: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
January 30, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor