+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor H.J. 784
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 744
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 481
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 707
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 413
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 380
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 196
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 9. H.J. 238
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 238 Amendment 1069rc
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 222
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 204
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 2. H.J. 176
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 68
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 22, 2016: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor