+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor H.J. 478
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor H.J. 398
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 344
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 354
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 327
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 323
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 268
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 251
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
- Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 1 Amendment 1069A
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 125
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 5. H.J. 132
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 59
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 52
+ − Votes (5)
February 22, 2021: Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 1. H.J. 327
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 16, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 268
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
February 9, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
- Yeas: 7
January 26, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 5. H.J. 132
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 5
January 25, 2021: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 1.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1