+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 H.J. 626
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 491
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 543
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 442
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 441 Amendment 1068A
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 416
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 355
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 391
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 370
On February 21, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 37
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2020: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
March 5, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 3, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 25, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (63)
Type:
Primary Sponsor