+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 491
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 542
On March 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Title amended, Passed S.J. 439 Amendment 1067K
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 439
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 438 Amendment 1067J
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1067H
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1067G
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 2.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 205
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 3. H.J. 262
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 262 Amendment 1067F
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1067E
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 37
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2020: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
March 5, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 3, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 11, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor