+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 30, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020 H.J. 629
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on March 23, 2020
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 11, 2020 H.J. 557
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 491
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 1. H.J. 504
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 420
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 420 Amendment 1065I
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 402
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1065G
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 205
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 6. H.J. 259
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 259 Amendment 1065F
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 244
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 232
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1065E
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 37
+ − Votes (4)
March 9, 2020: House of Representatives Concurred in amendments, Passed
March 4, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 27, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 11, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor