+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor on February 8, 2018 H.J. 394
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to the Governor on February 07, 2018 H.J. 366
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 394
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 347
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 337
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 S.J. 296
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 5. H.J. 233
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 16, NAYS 0. H.J. 191
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations H.J. 75
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 29
+ − Votes (3)
February 1, 2018: Senate Do Pass, Passed
January 30, 2018: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
January 25, 2018: Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsor
Committee on Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor